MD SB682 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a circuit court and the District Court to impose on a defendant a specified additional cost in specified cases; requiring all money collected from the additional costs to be paid to the Comptroller of the State; requiring the Comptroller to annually pay a specified amount to each county; and requiring each county to use specified money for a specified purpose.
Title
Courts - Animal-Related Crimes - Court Costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Animals
Circuit Courts
Comptroller
Counties
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Circuit Courts
Comptroller
Counties
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts