MD SB564 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 565
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 565
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county board of education to waive certain high school graduation requirements that are in addition to high school graduation requirements established by the State Board of Education for a student in foster care or who is a homeless youth if while in grade 11 or 12 the student transfers into the local school system from a different system in the State; prohibiting a county board from waiving certain requirements if it makes a finding that the student is reasonably capable of completing certain graduation requirements; etc.
Title
Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Students in Foster Care or Homeless Youth
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Washington [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Arthur Ellis [D] |
Sen. Katie Hester [D] | Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Obie Patterson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 565 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {454730/1 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB754 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Age
Counties
Curriculum
Education, Boards of
Foster Care
Indigent Persons
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Youth
Counties
Curriculum
Education, Boards of
Foster Care
Indigent Persons
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Youth