MD SB523 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland; providing for the composition, to include one member each from the Senate and House of Delegates of Maryland, cochairs, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {944239/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Apprentices
Armed Forces
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
Interest
Loans
Privatization
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Sunset
Armed Forces
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
Interest
Loans
Privatization
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Sunset