MD SB44 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Dorchester County Council to collect the Bay Restoration Fee on behalf of the Dorchester County Sanitary District.
Title
Dorchester County - Bay Restoration Fund - Collection of Restoration Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-01-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-01-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-01-27 | Favorable with Amendments 354137/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-01-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-04 | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-10-11 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
County Commissioners
County Councils
Dorchester County
Fees
Sanitary Districts
Sewage
Coastal Bays
County Commissioners
County Councils
Dorchester County
Fees
Sanitary Districts
Sewage