MD SB350 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the standards and requirements for the required warning period for violations recorded by speed monitoring systems; applying notice and signage standards for unmanned local stationary speed monitoring systems to all local speed monitoring systems; requiring the Maryland Police Training Commission to compile and make publicly available on or before December 31 of each year a report containing specified information on each local speed monitoring system program; etc.
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-15) (Y: 120 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-15) (Y: 120 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (120-15) |
2014-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {720718/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Environmental Matters |
2014-03-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {918676/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Associations
Citations
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Damages
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Fees
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Liability
License Plates
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Police Training Commission
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Schools
Recordings
Reports
Sheriffs
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Citations
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Damages
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Fees
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Liability
License Plates
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Police Training Commission
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Schools
Recordings
Reports
Sheriffs
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video