MD HB908 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person who leases vehicles to lessees from failing to include any dealer processing or freight charges in calculating the base lease payment shown in an advertisement for a leased vehicle, or from advertising to the general public a capitalized cost reduction to a lessee unless the capitalized cost reduction is offered to all potential lessees; and clarifying that specified provisions of law apply to an advertisement for a leased vehicle.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Advertising Practices
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-04-08 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Senators Astle, Glassman, and Kelley | |
2011-04-07 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | |
2011-04-08 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Delegates Stein, Malone, and Norman | |
2011-04-07 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-07 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2011-04-07 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Environmental Matters |