MD HB838 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Vocational and Technical Education Programs in Harford County; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force, in consultation with a specified committee, to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the Harford County Executive, the Harford County Board of Education, and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Vocational and Technical Education Programs in Harford County
Sponsors
Sen. Mary James [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-1) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-1) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2014-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {585464/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Harford County
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Harford County
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset