MD HB784 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a qualified nursing home to claim a refundable credit against the State income tax in the amount of sales and use tax paid for the purchase of a backup generator; and providing that the Act be applicable to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013, but before January 1, 2019.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Emergency Backup Generators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-1) (Y: 128 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-1) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {115266/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Comptroller
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Equipment
Exemptions
Income Tax
Nursing Homes
Publications
Sales and Use Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Sales and Use
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Equipment
Exemptions
Income Tax
Nursing Homes
Publications
Sales and Use Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Sales and Use