MD HB488 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the name of the Joint Committee on Access to Mental Health Services to the Joint Committee on Access to Behavioral Health Services; altering the duties of the Committee by requiring it to monitor access to specified behavioral health services and specified medically necessary services; and altering the information that must be included in a specified report to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
Joint Committee on Access to Mental Health Services - Name Change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {326682/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |