MD HB313 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-21 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-21 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Public School Stadium Grant Program; requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to implement and administer the Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual operating or capital budget bill an appropriation of $50,000,000 for the Program; and specifying that State funding provided under the Program is supplemental to public school construction funding from other sources.
Title
Education - Public School Stadium Grant Program - Established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB818 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Building Maintenance and Repair
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education, Boards of
Grants
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Secondary Schools
Stadiums
Budgets
Building Maintenance and Repair
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education, Boards of
Grants
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Secondary Schools
Stadiums
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0313?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0313f.pdf |