MD HB273 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene (DHMH) to establish a specified Prison In-Reach Program; requiring each county board of education to include behavioral health services with school health services; requiring DHMH to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2014 on a plan for statewide implementation of the School Health Program; requiring the Alcohol and Drug Abuse Administration to implement a specified program throughout the State; etc.
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2014-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Aging, Department of
Appropriations
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Counselors
Counties
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Elderly Persons
Electronic Government
Emergency Medical Services
Group Homes
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Housing
Juvenile Facilities
Local Government Mandates
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Minors
Physicians
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Schools
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Social Services
Social Workers
Students
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Youth
Aging, Department of
Appropriations
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Counselors
Counties
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Elderly Persons
Electronic Government
Emergency Medical Services
Group Homes
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Housing
Juvenile Facilities
Local Government Mandates
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Minors
Physicians
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Schools
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Social Services
Social Workers
Students
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Youth