MD HB1442 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to extend to employees of the Judicial Branch and the Legislative Branch of State government the application of any program, policy, or practice through which free ridership on transit vehicles is offered to employees of the Executive Branch of State government.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-42) (Y: 92 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-42) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-15 | House | Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate Schuh) Withdrawn |
2014-03-15 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-17 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Courts
Fees
General Assembly
Mass Transit
State Employees
Transportation - Generally
Courts
Fees
General Assembly
Mass Transit
State Employees
Transportation - Generally