MA S412 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S133
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the personal care allowance of residents of long-term care facilities. Elder Affairs.
Title
Increasing the personal needs allowance for residents of long term care facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied by S133 |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Accompanied by H735 |
2021-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H735 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Accompanied S412
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4052 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4011
S1579 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1281 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S133 (Replaces) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied by S412
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4052 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4011
S1579 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1281 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S133 (Replaces) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied by S412
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S412 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S412.pdf |