MA S2548 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2482
Note: Replaces legislation S2554
Note: Replaces legislation S2554
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Reprinted as amended, see S2554
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Reprinted as amended, see S2554
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for competitiveness and infrastructure investment in Massachusetts
Title
To provide for competitiveness and infrastructure investment in Massachusetts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #106 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment 7 Roll Call #105 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment 6 Roll Call #104 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment 7 Roll Call #105 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate Amendment 6 Roll Call #104 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-11 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2554 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Read third |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Timilty) rejected |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Timilty) rejected |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Tarr) adopted -see Roll Call #105 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Tarr) adopted -see Roll Call #104 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Tarr) rejected |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Tarr) rejected |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 11, 2024 |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2024-01-08 | Senate | New draft of S2482 |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2482 (Replaces) 2024-01-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2548
S2554 (Replaces) 2024-03-25 - Committee of conference appointed - (Michlewitz-Lewis-Muratore),in concurrence
H4414 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Rejected
H4446 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Adopted
H42 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H1884 (Similar To) 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4570
S2554 (Replaces) 2024-03-25 - Committee of conference appointed - (Michlewitz-Lewis-Muratore),in concurrence
H4414 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Rejected
H4446 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Adopted
H42 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H1884 (Similar To) 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4570