MA H4531 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Tamara M. Luciani, an employee of the Trial Court. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Tamara M. Luciani, an employee of the Trial Court of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Kip Diggs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-04-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-04-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-04-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-01 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3966 (Similar To) 2023-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2023
H4083 (Similar To) 2023-10-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2023
H4539 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4644 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4083 (Similar To) 2023-10-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2023
H4539 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4644 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4531 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4531.pdf |