MA H4246 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Littleton be authorized to provide drinking water to the inhabitants of the town of Boxborough. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing the town of Littleton to provide drinking water to the inhabitants of the town of Boxborough
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2024-03-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-02-22 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-02-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-01-08 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2023-12-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
2023-12-28 | House | Returned from the Secretary of State |
2023-11-15 | House | Transmitted to the State Secretary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4246 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4246.pdf |