MA H3942 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4441
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require post secondary institutions to inform students of their right to call their parents and their right to an attorney in the event of a disciplinary hearing that may result in expulsion. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to student’s rights in higher education
Sponsors
Rep. Cleon Turner [D] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. James Miceli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4441 |
2014-03-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2014 from 10:30 AM-12:30 PM in A-2 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Higher Education |
2013-12-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4441 (Replaced by) 2014-09-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3942 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3942.pdf |