MA H1947 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1059
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S1059
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S1059
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to food labeling By Mrs. Ferguson of Holden, a petition of Kimberly N. Ferguson, James R. Miceli and Matthew A. Beaton that the Department of Public Health implement a food labeling program for commercially caught, landed and sold saltwater fish . Public Health.
Title
Relative to food labeling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Accompanied S1059 |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1059 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1947 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1947.pdf |