LA SB59 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires student athletes access to mental health counseling at educational institutions. (gov sig) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires student athletes access to mental health counseling at educational institutions. (gov sig) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |