LA SB326 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for training and education on post traumatic stress and emotional support for certain fighters. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides for training and education on post traumatic stress and emotional support for certain fighters. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 326 CO-AUTHORS (#125) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 326 FINAL PASSAGE (#124) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 326 FINAL PASSAGE (#124) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported favorably (16-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-03-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |