KY HB60 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend various sections in KRS Chapter 189A relating to DUI to replace the current hardship license system with an ignition interlock licensing system.
Title
AN ACT relating to driving under the influence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 24, 2015 |
2015-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-06 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |