KY HB207 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 531.300 to define "child sex doll" and "traffic"; create new sections of KRS 531.310 to 531.370 to prohibit the possession, trafficking, importing, and advancing of a child sex doll; make technical corrections; amend KRS 531.010 and 531.340 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 378 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2964 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 77 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2964 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 77 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | House | passed 96-0 |
2024-03-27 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-25 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-07 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-07 | House | received in House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 06, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-16 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2024-01-31 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 01, 2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-01-26 | House | returned to Rules (H) |
2024-01-26 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | recommitted to Judiciary (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-01-23 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | introduced in House |