KY HB120 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.557 to require the Kentucky Board of Education to establish a statewide system of evaluation for all certified personnel; require the Department of Education, in partnership with professional organizations, to develop the system prior to the 2012-2013 school year; require the board to establish the weights to be applied to each performance criteria.
Title
AN ACT relating to educator evaluation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed | |
2011-02-16 | to Education (S) | |
2011-02-14 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-11 | 3rd reading, passed 92-2 with floor amendments (1) and (2) | |
2011-02-09 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 10, 2011 | |
2011-02-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-08 | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed | |
2011-02-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-04 | to Education (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB120.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB120/bill.doc |