KS SCR1602 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State constitutional amendment; term limits; legislators.
Title
State constitutional amendment; term limits; legislators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 118-N |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, Jan 30, 2013, 9:30 AM ROOM 546-E, CANCELLED |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 30, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 29, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 11, 2013 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/scr1602/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/scr1602_00_0000.pdf |