KS SB514 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - House Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - House Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 514 by Committee on Ways and Means - Making and concerning supplemental appropriations for fiscal years 2024 and 2025 and appropriations for fiscal years 2025, 2026, 2027 and 2028 for various state agencies.
Title
Substitute for SB 514 by Committee on Ways and Means - Making and concerning supplemental appropriations for fiscal years 2024 and 2025 and appropriations for fiscal years 2025, 2026, 2027 and 2028 for various state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 24 Nay: 15 (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 13 Nay: 23 (Y: 13 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was adopted - Yea: 20 Nay: 8 (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was rejected - Yea: 12 Nay: 19 (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holscher was rejected - Yea: 12 Nay: 21 (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected - Yea: 14 Nay: 19 (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 13 Nay: 23 (Y: 13 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was adopted - Yea: 20 Nay: 8 (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was rejected - Yea: 12 Nay: 19 (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holscher was rejected - Yea: 12 Nay: 21 (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected - Yea: 14 Nay: 19 (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-19 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 24 Nay: 15 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 23 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Straub was rejected |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Straub |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was rejected |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Steffen was rejected |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Steffen |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Blasi was adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Blasi |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Senator Longbine raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Doll |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was adopted Yea: 20 Nay: 8 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pyle |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was rejected Yea: 12 Nay: 19 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Doll |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holscher was rejected Yea: 12 Nay: 21 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holscher |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected Yea: 14 Nay: 19 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Steffen was adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Steffen |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |