KS HB2300 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a duly ordained minister of religion to report certain abuse and neglect of children except when reporting would violate the penitential communication privilege.
Title
Requiring a duly ordained minister of religion to report certain abuse and neglect of children except when reporting would violate the penitential communication privilege.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2023-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | House | House Introduced |