IN HB1048 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Representative Harman added as coauthor.
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Representative Harman added as coauthor.
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes knowingly or intentionally possessing a firearm: (1) in or on school property; (2) in or on property that is not school property and is being used by a school for a school function; or (3) on a school bus; a Class A misdemeanor instead of a Level 6 felony. Provides that for purposes of the law concerning possession of firearms on school property: (1) school property means a building or other structure owned or rented by a school that is being used exclusively by the school for a school function and does not include grounds adjacent to and owned or rented in common with the building or other structure; (2) property that is not school property that is being used for a school function if the property is being used exclusively by a school for a school function, the property is not accessible to the general public during the school function, and a notice is conspicuously posted at each entrance to the property that states that the property is being used by a school for a school function; and (3) the law does not apply to a person who may legally possess a firearm and possesses a firearm that is locked in the trunk of the person's motor vehicle, kept in the glove compartment of the person's locked motor vehicle, or stored out of plain sight in the person's locked motor vehicle. Removes a provision from the law concerning firearms in locked vehicles that allows a person to adopt a policy or rule that prohibits an employee of the person from possessing a firearm or ammunition in or on school property, in or on property that is being used by a school for a school function, or on a school bus in violation of: (1) student discipline laws concerning possession of firearms; or (2) the law concerning possession of firearms on school property and school buses. Specifies that the law
Title
Possession of firearms.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Lucas [R] | Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] | Rep. Timothy Harman [R] |
Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Ben Smaltz [R] | Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] |
Rep. Mike Speedy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | House | Representative Harman added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Representative Ober added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Representative Smaltz added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Representative Washburne added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Representative Speedy added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Goodin added as coauthor. |
2014-01-09 | House | Representative Eberhart added as coauthor. |
2014-01-09 | House | Representative VanNatter added as coauthor. |
2014-01-07 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Policy |
2014-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Lucas |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1048/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/e/a/6aea9065/HB1048.01.INTR.pdf |