IL SR1011 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President Obama to temporarily increase the amount of trucking weight allowed on the country's interstate highways from 80,000 to 100,000 in order to drive down the price of propane.
Title
TRUCK WEIGHT - PROPANE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1011&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SR/09800SR1011.htm |