IL SR0733 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Supreme Court and relevant authorities to require, as a consistent part of continuing education, LGBTQ+ and HIV cultural competency education for all attorneys, judges, and courtroom staff in the State of Illinois.
Title
IL COURTS-LGBTQ+ & HIV ED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=733&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SR/10300SR0733.htm |