IL SB3755 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the notice of the transfer of property that is exempt for orphanage, school, or religious purposes shall be filed with the county clerk (currently, the county recorder). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-RELIGIOUS PROPERTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |