IL SB3554 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1008
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1008
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Adds one non-voting member to the Illinois Purchased Care Review Board. Requires the member to be an administrator of a private, nonpublic, special education school.
Title
SCH CD-PURCHASE CARE REVIEW BD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1008 |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-035-000 |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-04-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-7.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |