IL SB3473 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that the State Board of Education, in coordination with the Department of Public Health, shall develop type 1 diabetes informational materials for parents and guardians of students. Provides that the informational materials shall be made available to each school district and charter school on the State Board's website. Provides that the school board of a school district and the governing body of a charter school shall make the informational materials accessible to a parent or guardian when the student is first enrolled in elementary school or in a school's student handbook on and after July 1, 2024. Sets forth what the provided information may include. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-DIABETES INFORMATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2024-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |