IL SB3440 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1006
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1006
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Rural/Downstate Health Act. Provides that moneys from fees shall be deposited into the Rural/Downstate Health Access Fund. Provides that moneys in the Rural/Downstate Health Access Fund may be used for programs for the medically underserved. Provides that fees may be collected by the Center for Rural Health and deposited into the Fund for the purpose of administering the J-1 Visa Waiver Program for international medical graduates and that the fees shall be dedicated to funding the J-1 Visa Waiver Program and may not be subject to the Fund's distribution formula. Makes other changes.
Title
DOWNSTATE HEALTH ACT-FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1006 |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-040-001 |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Accessibility Committee; 007-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability and Accessibility Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-04-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-013-000 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-002-000 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 65 | 5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |