IL SB3353 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Restorative Justice
Pending: House Restorative Justice Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Restorative Justice
Pending: House Restorative Justice Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the bill as amended by Senate Amendment No. 1. Provides that the Community-Based Corrections Task Force shall study and develop innovative ways to introduce community-based corrections and rehabilitation into the State's correctional system and develop a community-based correctional program that would support or remove barriers to community-based corrections in Illinois, with a focus on pretrial services and those sentenced to probation. Removes from the Community-Based Corrections Task Force a member who represents an organization that advocates for sentencing reform appointed by the Department of Corrections Parole Division. Adds various other members to the Task Force. Provides that appointments to the Task Force shall be made within 90 (rather than 30) days after the effective date of this Act. Provides that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority (rather than the Department of Corrections) shall provide administrative and technical support for the Task Force and is responsible for ensuring that the requirements of the Task Force are met. Provides that on or before December 31, 2025 (rather than on or before July 1, 2025), the Task Force shall publish a final report of its findings, developments, and recommendations and after the publication of its final report the Task Force shall be dissolved. Makes technical changes. Effective immediately.
Title
COMMUNITY-BASED COR TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] |
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Paul Faraci [D] | Rep. Gregg Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4a |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4a |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |