IL SB3137 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
Pending: House Mental Health & Addiction Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 10:00 am in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
Pending: House Mental Health & Addiction Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 10:00 am in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the bill, as amended by Senate Amendments numbers 1 and 2 with the following change, in the amendatory changes to the Substance Use Disorder Act, provides that the notice shall be provided for persons whose death occurred in a licensed facility for the treatment of substance use disorders (rather than at treatment programs). Effective immediately.
Title
MENTAL HEALTH-DEATH NOTICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Behavioral and Mental Health; 007-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Behavioral and Mental Health; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 301 | 55-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
405 | 5 | 5-100.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |