IL SB3136 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
Pending: House Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
Pending: House Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Family Recovery Plans Implementation Task Force Act. Provides that it is the General Assembly's intent to require a coordinated, public health, and service-integrated response by various agencies within the State's health and child welfare systems to address the substance use treatment needs of infants born with prenatal substance exposure, as well as the treatment needs of their caregivers and families, by requiring the development, provision, and monitoring of family recovery plans. Creates the Family Recovery Plans Implementation Task Force within the Department of Human Services. Sets forth the duties of the Task Force, including reviewing models of family recovery plans that have been implemented in other states; and reviewing and developing recommendations to replace punitive policies with notification policies for health care professionals reporting a positive toxicology screen of a newborn. Contains provisions concerning Task Force membership, meetings, reporting requirements, and other matters. Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to develop a standardized CAPTA notification form that is separate and distinct from the form for written confirmation reports of child abuse or neglect. Provides that a CAPTA notification shall not be treated as a report of suspected child abuse or neglect, shall not be recorded in the State Central Registry, and shall not be discoverable or admissible as evidence in any juvenile court or adoption proceeding unless the named party waives, in writing, his or her right to confidentiality. Repeals a provision requiring the Department to report to the State's Attorney every report of a newborn infant whose blood, urine, or meconium contains a prohibited controlled substance. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Removes newborn infants whose blood, urine, or meconium contains any amount of a controlled substance from the list of children presumed neglected or abused under the Act. Makes corresponding changes to a provision listing the types of evidence that constitute prima facie evidence of neglect and to relevant provisions under the Adoption Act. Effective immediately, except that some parts take effect January 1, 2025.
Title
FAMILY RECOVERY PLANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2024-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-04-30 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-015-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 006-003-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
325 | 5 | 4.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 50 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |