IL SB2998 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0837
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0837
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Makes changes to provisions concerning the qualifications for licensure as an advanced practice nurse. Provides that an applicant for licensure to practice as an advanced practice nurse shall have successfully completed requirements to practice as, and holds and maintains (rather than only holds) a current, national certification as a nurse midwife, clinical nurse specialist, nurse practitioner, or certified registered nurse anesthetist from the appropriate national certifying body as determined by rule of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Deletes provisions concerning license renewal requirements for certain advanced practice nurses licensed before the 95th General Assembly.
Title
ADVNCED PRACTICE NURSE-LICENSE
Sponsors
Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. William Haine [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] |
Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0837 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-09 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2014-03-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 65 | 15-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |