IL SB2646 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
Pending: Senate Paid Leave Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
Pending: Senate Paid Leave Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Paid Leave for All Workers Act. Provides that the definition of "employer" does not include forest preserve districts organized under the Downstate Forest Preserve District Act or the Cook County Forest Preserve District Act, municipalities organized under the Illinois Municipal Code, townships organized under the Township Code, or counties organized under the Counties Code.
Title
PAID LEAVE FOR ALL-EMPLOYERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Paid Leave |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 192 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2646&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2646.htm |