IL SB0925 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0512
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the administration of the Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-OPERATION-DURATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-19SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0512
2013-08-19SenateEffective Date January 1, 2014
2013-08-19SenateGovernor Approved
2013-06-20SenateSent to the Governor
2013-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2013-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-013-000
2013-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2013-05-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2013-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2013-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-001-000
2013-05-10HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2013
2013-05-06HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2013-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2013-04-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
2013-04-18HouseArrived in House
2013-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2013-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2013-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2013
2013-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
2013-04-17SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2013-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 013-000-000
2013-04-16SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
2013-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2013-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2013-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2013-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013
2013-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2013-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013
2013-03-20SenateDo Pass Executive; 010-000-000
2013-03-13SenateAssigned to Executive
2013-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2013-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62552-102Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback