IL SB0509 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
MUNI CD-TIF-WAUKEGAN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-12-03 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-16 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-05-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 011-000-000 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 30, 2014 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 1-1001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |