IL SB0209 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides legislative findings. Appropriates specified amounts to the Department of Public Health for grants, expenses, and administrative costs of programs relating to acquired immunodeficiency syndrome and human immunodeficiency virus; the Getting to Zero-Illinois plan to end the HIV epidemic by 2030; the prevention, screening, and treatment services to address sexually transmitted infection cases; and the PrEP4Illinois Program to provide client navigation for pre-exposure prophylaxis services and medication access. Contains other provisions. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
$DPH-HIV/AIDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=209&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/PDF/10300SB0209.pdf |