IL SB0075 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Second Chance Public Health and Safety Act and amends the Freedom of Information Act, the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, and the Unified Code of Corrections. Contains declarations and findings. Creates the Department of Returning Resident Affairs and sets forth its powers in relation to returning residents (residents who have been detained, are defendants in criminal prosecutions, are incarcerated, or have been incarcerated) and other matters. Provides that the Department shall develop and administer the Second Chance State Program for returning residents and provides for the establishment of hub sites to provide specified services to eligible individuals and other elements of the Program. Provides for the appointment of a Director of Returning Resident Affairs who has experience working with or for a community-based organization and was incarcerated in an Illinois Department of Corrections facility for not less than one year, as well as an Assistant Director and a General Counsel. Contains provisions regarding other matters. Provides that the provisions of the Act are severable. Effective immediately.
Title
DPT RETURNING RESIDENT AFFAIRS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 5-172 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 5 | 5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 5-240 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 5 | 5-402 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-14-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=75&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0075.htm |