IL SB0016 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the School Code's construction.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Amendment in Senate (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Amendment in Senate (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-11-14 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-08-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2014-06-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-28 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 032-019-006 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Adopted; Manar |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Manar |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Withdrawn by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; 033-022-000; Manar |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-003-003 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-003-003 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. William Delgado |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-005-001 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Education |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 16, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-003-001 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 8, 2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-002-002 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Executive; 002-001-000 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |