IL HB4948 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 |
2014-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2014-03-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 2-201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |