IL HB4675 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Permanent Noise Monitoring Act. Provides that the Division of Aeronautics of the Illinois Department of Transportation shall provide residents of Illinois a method of submitting noise complaints concerning airports in the State to the Division of Aeronautics. Requires the Division of Aeronautics to develop and maintain a database of these noise complaints and submit a report on the contents of this database to the Governor and the General Assembly on December 31 of each year.
Title
AIRPORT NOISE COMPLAINTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-10-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4675&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB4675.htm |