IL HB4293 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Massage Licensing Act. Requires a prosecuting attorney to provide notice to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation of the licensed massage therapist's name, address, practice address, and license number and a copy of the criminal charges filed immediately after a licensed massage therapist has been charged with any of the following offenses: an offense for which the sentence includes registration as a sex offender; involuntary sexual servitude of a minor; the crime of battery against a patient, including any offense based on sexual conduct or sexual penetration, in the course of patient care or treatment; or a forcible felony. Provides that, if the victim of the crime the licensee has been charged with is a patient of the licensee, the prosecuting attorney shall also provide notice to the Department of the patient's name. Within 5 business days after receiving notice from the prosecuting attorney of the filing of criminal charges against the licensed massage therapist, requires the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation to issue an administrative order that the licensed massage therapist shall practice only with a chaperone during all patient encounters pending the outcome of the criminal proceedings. Provides that the chaperone shall be a licensed massage therapist or other health care worker licensed by the Department. Provides that the chaperone shall provide written notice to all of the licensed massage therapist's patients explaining the Department's order to use a chaperone. Requires the licensed massage therapist to provide a written plan of compliance with the administrative order that is acceptable to the Department within 5 business days after receipt of the administrative order. Provides that failure to comply with the administrative order, failure to file a compliance plan, or failure to follow the compliance plan shall subject the licensed massage therapist to temporary suspension of his or her license until the completion of the criminal proceedings.
Title
MASSAGE THERAPY-MISCONDUCT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-001 |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2023-12-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 57 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |