IL HB3724 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-10)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-10)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Critical Health Problems and Comprehensive Health Education Act. Provides that training on how to properly administer cardiopulmonary resuscitation and how to use an automated external defibrillator shall be included as a basis for health education curricula in all secondary schools in this State and shall be a prerequisite to receiving a high school diploma. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
HEALTH ED-CPR/AED TRAINING REQ
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0632 |
2014-06-05 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2014 |
2014-06-05 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-05-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-004-000 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 014-000-000 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2014-04-01 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-012-001 |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2014-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2014-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 008-002-000 |
2014-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 008-002-000 |
2014-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2014-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 011-000-002 |
2014-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2014-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2014-02-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2014-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-01-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-01-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-10-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-10-23 | House | First Reading |
2013-10-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 110 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |