IL HB3692 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With respect to the report that a school district submits to the State Board of Education if the district receives an Early Childhood Education Block Grant and the report that the Chicago school district submits to the State Board on the use of its general education and educational services block grants, provides that if the district does not submit the report to the State Board in a timely manner then the State Board shall withhold all payments owed to the district until the report is submitted, reviewed, and made public by the State Board. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
SCH CD-BLOCK GRANTS-REPORTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-10-22 | House | First Reading |
2013-10-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2013-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2013-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2013-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2013-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2013-10-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-10-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2013-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2013-10-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1C-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1D-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3692&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3692.htm |