IL HB3222 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-26 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-26 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Makes changes to the Language Equity and Access Act. Creates the Division of Language Equity and Access within the Governor's Office of New Americans to lead Statewide efforts in the implementation of the State's language equity and access policy for Limited English Proficient persons and to ensure meaningful access to information, services, programs, and activities offered by State agencies and other covered entities, including departments, offices, commissions, boards, or other agencies for Limited English Proficient persons. Provides that the role of the Division is to advance and monitor implementation of and compliance with the Act. Provides that the Division shall work with State agencies, covered entities and use other available State resources, such as the Office of New Americans, the Office of Equity, and the Department of Human Services Bureau of Refugee and Immigrant Services, to ensure that the State compiles available U.S. Census data on languages used across the State, including the identification of geographic patterns and trend data. Provides that each State agency and covered entity shall prepare a language access plan that will describe its Limited English Proficient service population, the policy and programmatic actions it will implement and the metrics that will be used to measure compliance. Provides that the Division will prepare and submit a Language Equity and Access Compliance Report to the General Assembly on an annual basis by January 1, 2024. Provides that the Governor's Office shall provide administrative and other support to the Governor's Office of New Americans and its Division of Language Equity and Access. Defines terms. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
LANGUAGE EQUITY & ACCESS ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro |
2023-10-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 21, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-05-03 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-05-03 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-05-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-05-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2023-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2023-05-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-034-001 |
2023-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 007-000-000 |
2023-04-25 | House | Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-25 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 008-002-000 |
2023-03-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-03-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar |