ID S1420 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Signed by Governor on 04/04/14 Session Law Chapter 354 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Signed by Governor on 04/04/14 Session Law Chapter 354 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates and transfers $225,800 from the General Fund to the Time Sensitive Emergencies Registry Fund for fiscal year 2015; increases the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare for Emergency Medical Services by $322,200 for fiscal year 2015; and reduces the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare for Physical Health Services by $96,400 for fiscal year 2015.
Title
Appropriates and transfers $225,800 from the General Fund to the Time Sensitive Emergencies Registry Fund for fiscal year 2015; increases the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare for Emergency Medical Services by $322,200 for fiscal year 2015; and reduces the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare for Physical Health Services by $96,400 for fiscal year 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/04/14 Session Law Chapter 354 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/24/14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | House | Stevenson |
2014-03-20 | House | 50-18-2 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Bateman, Bell, Bolz, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gibbs, Hancey, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Malek, Meline, Miller, Morse, Moyle, Packer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Shepherd, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Batt, Boyle, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Gestrin, Harris, Holtzclaw, Luker, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Monks, Nielsen, Palmer, Sims Absent -- Anderst, Youngblood Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2014-03-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-19 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-19 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Schmidt |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 26-7-2 AYES -- Bair, Bock, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, Patrick, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Tippets, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- Bayer, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Pearce, Thayn, Vick Absent and excused -- McKenzie, Rice Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-19 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |